TN SJR0127 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Celebrating "National Engineers Week," February 22–28, 2015.
Title
Celebrating "National Engineers Week," February 22–28, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-03-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-03-02 | House | Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2015-02-26 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/2/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |