TN SJR0077 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-14 - Failed In S. Jud Comm. Ayes 2, Nays 2 PNV 3
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-14 - Failed In S. Jud Comm. Ayes 2, Nays 2 PNV 3
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes statewide popular election of the lieutenant governor, attorney general and reporter, and secretary of state.
Title
Proposes statewide popular election of the lieutenant governor, attorney general and reporter, and secretary of state.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Berke [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-14 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: fails - remains in Jud. Comm (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Failed In S. Jud Comm. Ayes 2, Nays 2 PNV 3 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm. | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for intro. |