TN SJR0043 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on January 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on January 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner David W. Purkey
Title
Commissioner David W. Purkey
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-01-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-01-10 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 1/10/2019 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |