TN SB3647 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1106
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1106
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Doe Mountain Recreation Authority Act of 2012." - Amends TCA Title 11 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Doe Mountain Recreation Authority Act of 2012." - Amends TCA Title 11 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - S. E&E COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Govt. Ops. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - S. E&E COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Govt. Ops. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 1106 | |
2012-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/12 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-05-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-05-01 | S. concurred in H. am. 1 | |
2012-05-01 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-30 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-27 | Reset on Next cal. | |
2012-04-27 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1103) | |
2012-04-27 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-04-25 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/26/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-04-16 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-04-16 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2012-04-16 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0959) | |
2012-04-16 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1131) | |
2012-04-12 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2012 | |
2012-04-12 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/16/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/12/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-03-30 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Ref. to S. Gov. Ops Comm. | |
2012-03-27 | Recalled from S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-03-21 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. E&E Comm. cal. for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Action Def. in S. E&E Comm. to 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. E&E Comm. cal. for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. E&E Comm. | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3111 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1106