TN HB3111 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1106
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1106
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Doe Mountain Recreation Authority Act of 2012." - Amends TCA Title 11 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Doe Mountain Recreation Authority Act of 2012." - Amends TCA Title 11 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSERVATION & ENVIRONMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSERVATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Conservation & Environment Comm (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSERVATION & ENVIRONMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSERVATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Conservation & Environment Comm (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1106 | |
2012-04-27 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-24 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/26/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-18 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to next calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Re-referred To: Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-04-09 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on cal. Conservation & Environment Committee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Conservation & Environment Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on s/c cal Conservation Subcommittee for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Mtg. Cancelled Action Def. in s/c Conservation Subcommittee to 3/27/12 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal Conservation Subcommittee for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in s/c Conservation Subcommittee to 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal Conservation Subcommittee for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Assigned to s/c Conservation Subcommittee | |
2012-01-30 | P2C, ref. to Conservation & Environment Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3647 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1106