TN SB3059 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines "employee" for the purposes of the prohibition on a deposition being taken by an employee of one of the parties or of an attorney for one of the parties. - Amends TCA Section 24-9-136.
Title
As enacted, defines "employee" for the purposes of the prohibition on a deposition being taken by an employee of one of the parties or of an attorney for one of the parties. - Amends TCA Section 24-9-136.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1016 | |
2010-05-24 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1248) | |
2010-05-24 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3380 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 1016