TN HB3380 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 1016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 1016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines "employee" for the purposes of the prohibition on a deposition being taken by an employee of one of the parties or of an attorney for one of the parties. - Amends TCA Section 24-9-136.
Title
As enacted, defines "employee" for the purposes of the prohibition on a deposition being taken by an employee of one of the parties or of an attorney for one of the parties. - Amends TCA Section 24-9-136.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Pub. Ch. 1016 | |
2010-06-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-03 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-06-03 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-01 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-05-27 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-25 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/27/10 | |
2010-05-24 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-24 | S. adopted am. 2 | |
2010-05-24 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-05-13 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-05-12 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-05-12 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-12 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1498) | |
2010-05-12 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1427) | |
2010-05-12 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA1525) | |
2010-05-10 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/12/10 | |
2010-05-10 | Reset on reg cal. for 5/12/10 | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/06/2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 5/6/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/29/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/27/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3059 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1016