TN SB2943 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1089
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1089
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, states that coverage made available in plans under the Memphis Plan Act of 1991 shall constitute minimum essential health coverage for purposes of compliance with certain federal minimum coverage requirements; specifies that operation consistent with the present law standards described in the Memphis Plan Act of 1991 would create a presumption that the operating entity is a "health care sharing ministry" under federal law regarding minimum essential coverage. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, states that coverage made available in plans under the Memphis Plan Act of 1991 shall constitute minimum essential health coverage for purposes of compliance with certain federal minimum coverage requirements; specifies that operation consistent with the present law standards described in the Memphis Plan Act of 1991 would create a presumption that the operating entity is a "health care sharing ministry" under federal law regarding minimum essential coverage. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 1089 | |
2012-05-29 | Effective date(s) 07/01/12 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-05-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-05-01 | S. concurred in H. am. 1 | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 5/1/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-30 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1013) | |
2012-04-30 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-03-22 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-03-19 | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-16 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/19/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-03-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-28 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-14 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-01-30 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2012-01-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3157 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1089