TN SB2927 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires policies and rules of the department of health to be fully consistent with the recommendations of the Centers for Disease Control concerning excluding children from school for head lice. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires policies and rules of the department of health to be fully consistent with the recommendations of the Centers for Disease Control concerning excluding children from school for head lice. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-19 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3210 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-17 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Public Health and Family Assistance of HHR of Health & Human Resources Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2927&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2927.pdf |