TN SB2915 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, rewrites the civil service system for the city fire department. - Amends Chapter 104 of the Acts of 1903; as amended and rewritten.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 104 of the Acts of 1903; as amended and rewritten by Chapter 76 of the Private Acts of 2005; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter of the City of Newport.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 61 | |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/28/2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2895 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Pr. Ch. 61