TN SB2897 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the governing body of the city of Crossville to allow participation in public meetings by electronic or other means. - Amends TCA Section 8-44-108.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the governing body of the city of Crossville to allow participation in public meetings by electronic or other means. - Amends TCA Section 8-44-108.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Reset on next available calendar |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2815 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-01 - Held on desk.