TN HB2815 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the governing body of the city of Crossville to allow participation in public meetings by electronic or other means. - Amends TCA Section 8-44-108.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the governing body of the city of Crossville to allow participation in public meetings by electronic or other means. - Amends TCA Section 8-44-108.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Held on desk. |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment |
2020-03-19 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment #1 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-03-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0687) |
2020-03-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0671) |
2020-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2897 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted