TN SB2883 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Prostate-Specific Antigen Screening for High-risk Insured Men Act," which requires health insurance coverage for the early detection of prostate cancer for men who meet certain risk criteria or age thresholds. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to insurance coverage of prostate cancer screenings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2954 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.