TN SB2693 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 1012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 1012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a director of schools and board of education from using abolition of a position as a method of avoiding dismissal charges against a teacher and the accompanying due process rights attaching to the status of tenure.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a director of schools and board of education from using abolition of a position as a method of avoiding dismissal charges against a teacher and the accompanying due process rights attaching to the status of tenure.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Haynes [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Pub. Ch. 1012 | |
2012-05-21 | Effective date(s) 05/15/12 | |
2012-05-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-05-01 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-01 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-04-26 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 2 | |
2012-04-26 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1261) | |
2012-04-26 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-04-11 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-04-09 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-04-09 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 28, Nays 2 | |
2012-04-09 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1061) | |
2012-04-05 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 | |
2012-03-28 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 | |
2012-03-22 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm. | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-23 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2738 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1012