TN HB2738 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a director of schools and board of education from using abolition of a position as a method of avoiding dismissal charges against a teacher and the accompanying due process rights attaching to the status of tenure.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a director of schools and board of education from using abolition of a position as a method of avoiding dismissal charges against a teacher and the accompanying due process rights attaching to the status of tenure.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1012 | |
2012-04-26 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-24 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-10 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-03-29 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2693 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 1012