TN SB2625 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes off-highway vehicles to be operated on certain designated roads and highways in Perry County. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-185.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 55-8-185, relative to operation of off-highway vehicles on certain roads and highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2742 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee