TN SB2588 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires fiscal notes for bills that criminalize activities, or enhance existing criminal penalties, to include a statement on the impact upon Tennessee if such bill does not become law. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires fiscal notes for bills that criminalize activities, or enhance existing criminal penalties, to include a statement on the impact upon Tennessee if such bill does not become law. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2330 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-08 - Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to Summer Study
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2588&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2588.pdf |