TN SB2547 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes clerks of court, county clerks, registers of deeds, and county trustees to enter into agreements with a fingerprint vendor that is under contract with the Tennessee bureau of investigation for purposes of providing fingerprint capture services for fingerprint-based background checks permitted by law; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, Chapter 6, relative to criminal background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2022 | |
2022-05-25 | Pub. Ch. 1037 | |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0900) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0900) |
2022-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0721) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2780 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1037