TN SB2507 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires youth development centers and jails to reduce the cost of telephone services to inmates in effect on July 1, 2022, by 50 percent by July 1, 2025; requires correctional facilities to reduce the cost of telephone services to inmates in effect on July 1, 2022, by 50 percent by July 1, 2027. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 41, relative to telephone services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2750 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Failed in s/c Corrections Subcommittee of State Government Committee