TN SB2458 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from three days to three months, the amount of paid leave provided to the officers and employees of the various agencies, boards, and departments of state government in the event of death of such officers' or employees' children or stepchildren. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 50, relative to bereavement leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2338 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Failed for lack of second in: Public Service Subcommittee