TN SB2449 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1073
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1073
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a hospital from restricting a patient from having at least one patient representative as a visitor during a period when COVID-19 is a healthcare concern, if certain requirements met; specifies that the requirement that any disciplinary process, or action taken pursuant to such process, that is implemented by a health-related board regarding the dispensing or prescribing of medication for COVID-19 must be promulgated as an administrative rule does not apply to the dispensing or prescribing of controlled substances; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 14; Title 29; Title 49; Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14; Title 29; Title 49; Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy McNally [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1073 | |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 4/27/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2665 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022