TN HB2665 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a hospital from restricting a patient from having at least one patient representative as a visitor during a period when COVID-19 is a healthcare concern, if certain requirements met; specifies that the requirement that any disciplinary process, or action taken pursuant to such process, that is implemented by a health-related board regarding the dispensing or prescribing of medication for COVID-19 must be promulgated as an administrative rule does not apply to the dispensing or prescribing of controlled substances; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 14; Title 29; Title 49; Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14; Title 29; Title 49; Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2022 | |
2022-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 1073 | |
2022-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-28 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 84, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB2665 |
2022-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/28/22 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0623) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0964) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-07 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0791) |
2022-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-03-02 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2449 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1073