TN SB2446 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a local government to require a private employer to pay an hourly wage in excess of the minimum hourly wage set by state or federal law. - Amends TCA Title 12 and Title 50, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 12 and Title 50, Chapter 2, relative to wages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2829 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee