TN SB2442 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, negates mandatory application of certain laws on local governments that are not fully funded; prohibits an agency of state government from creating a new fee that will impact local governments in any year in which the general state revenues to the agency have decreased from the previous year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53; Title 10; Title 12; Title 41 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, negates mandatory application of certain laws on local governments that are not fully funded; prohibits an agency of state government from creating a new fee that will impact local governments in any year in which the general state revenues to the agency have decreased from the previous year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53; Title 10; Title 12; Title 41 and Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2592 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee