TN HB2592 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, negates mandatory application of certain laws on local governments that are not fully funded; prohibits an agency of state government from creating a new fee that will impact local governments in any year in which the general state revenues to the agency have decreased from the previous year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53; Title 10; Title 12; Title 41 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, negates mandatory application of certain laws on local governments that are not fully funded; prohibits an agency of state government from creating a new fee that will impact local governments in any year in which the general state revenues to the agency have decreased from the previous year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53; Title 10; Title 12; Title 41 and Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2442 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee