TN SB2393 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, shortens, from September 30 to September 15, the deadline in which opioid fund deposits, abatement strategies, and disbursement or expenses paid from the fund must be reported to executive and legislative branch officials. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 9; Title 20; Title 29; Title 33; Title 47; Title 53; Title 67, Chapter 4; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 9; Title 20; Title 29; Title 33; Title 47; Title 53; Title 67, Chapter 4; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to the disbursement of monies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2597 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee