TN SB2372 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Transportation Services District Act," creating transportation services district consisting of certain counties; authorizes special allocation of surplus state tax revenue within the district to eligible counties for transportation services. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67, relative to revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2494 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee