TN SB2348 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, revises charter of town of Gainesboro to specify duties of Town Recorder. - Amends Chapter 26 of the Acts of 1905; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, revises charter of town of Gainesboro to specify duties of Town Recorder. - Amends Chapter 26 of the Acts of 1905; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 6 | |
2009-04-13 | Comp. HB subst. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Sen. Local Bill Calendar cal. for 04/13/2009 | |
2009-03-09 | P2C held on desk. Local Bill | |
2009-03-05 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-03-05 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2381 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-12 - Pr. Ch. 6