TN HB2381 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Pr. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Pr. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, revises charter of town of Gainesboro to specify duties of Town Recorder. - Amends Chapter 26 of the Acts of 1905; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, revises charter of town of Gainesboro to specify duties of Town Recorder. - Amends Chapter 26 of the Acts of 1905; as amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Pr. Ch. 6 | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-04-22 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-04-14 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-04-13 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-13 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-04-13 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-04-09 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-04-09 | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-06 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/09 | |
2009-04-06 | Objected to on Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-02 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/6/09 | |
2009-03-12 | P2C held on desk. | |
2009-03-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-03-05 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2348 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-12 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 6
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2381&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2381.pdf |