CA SB949 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 69894.1 to the Government Code, relating to courts.
Title
Superior court: lactation accommodation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent SB949 Blakespear et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - SB 949 Blakespear Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB949 Blakespear (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - SB 949 Blakespear Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB949 Blakespear (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-07-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4932.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6036.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3771.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | April 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3446.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69894.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |