TN SB2345 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the requirement that a registered voter be a bona fide member of, affiliated with, or declare allegiance to a political party in order to vote in a political party's primary election; removes the requirement that the officer of elections at each polling place post a sign stating that it is a crime to vote in a political party's primary election without being a bona fide member of, or affiliated with, that political party, or to declare allegiance to that party without the intent to affiliate with that party. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 7, relative to primary elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2634 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-20 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee