TN SB2316 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from at least 30 days to at least 60 days prior to the expiration, the notice that the department of commerce and insurance must send to inform a fire protection sprinkler systems contractor of the impending expiration of certificate of registration or license. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 62, Chapter 32.
Title
As introduced, increases, from at least 30 days to at least 60 days prior to the expiration, the notice that the department of commerce and insurance must send to inform a fire protection sprinkler systems contractor of the impending expiration of certificate of registration or license. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 62, Chapter 32.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2617 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee