TN SB2312 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an owner or resident of real property to notify a neighbor who owns or resides on contiguous real property of the owner's intent to trim, cut, prune, or remove a tree that is greater than 36 feet in height if the distance from the base of the tree to the neighbor's real property line is equal to or less than the height of the tree. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 66 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 66 and Title 68, relative to trees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2260 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-22 - Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee