TN SB2264 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a real estate broker licensee who is in good standing with the Tennessee real estate commission at the time the person's license is temporarily retired, and who, as a retiree, has not paid the license renewal fee, causing the license to lapse, to reactivate the license upon completing payment of all back renewal fees owed and any penalty imposed by the commission resulting from the lapsed license and submission of proof of completion of all classroom hours in real estate courses that would have been required under state law if the licensee had maintained an active license during the period of temporary retirement. - Amends TCA Title 62 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62 and Title 63, relative to professions.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0796) |
2024-04-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0738) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0731) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2440 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Sponsor(s) Added.