TN SB2199 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a student who as an entering freshman meets all nonacademic requirements, but not the academic requirements for a HOPE scholarship, to qualify for the scholarship by meeting the collegiate grade point average continuation requirements after enrolling in an eligible postsecondary institution. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, allows a student who as an entering freshman meets all nonacademic requirements, but not the academic requirements for a HOPE scholarship, to qualify for the scholarship by meeting the collegiate grade point average continuation requirements after enrolling in an eligible postsecondary institution. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/22/2010 | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2342 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-17 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2199&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2199.pdf |