TN SB2147 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes changes to the law protecting elderly persons and disabled adults. - Amends TCA Title 30; Title 31; Title 32; Title 34; Title 35; Title 36; Title 39 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 30; Title 31; Title 32; Title 34; Title 35; Title 36; Title 39 and Title 71, relative to elderly and vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Effective date(s) 04/23/2024 | |
2024-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 772 | |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0, PNV 1 (Amendment 1 - HA0889) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0889) |
2024-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0599) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2420 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 772