TN SB2138 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 601
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 601
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Heritage Protection Act of 2016." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Heritage Protection Act of 2016." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 601 | |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/16/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2129 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-22 - Pub. Ch. 601