TN HB2129 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Pub. Ch. 601
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Pub. Ch. 601
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Heritage Protection Act of 2016." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Heritage Protection Act of 2016." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve McDaniel [R] | Rep. Ron Lollar [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] |
Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] |
Rep. Jamie Jenkins [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] |
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. John Holsclaw [R] |
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. David Alexander [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] |
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] |
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Jeremy Durham [R] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY Towns PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY Towns PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Pub. Ch. 601 | |
2016-03-22 | Effective date(s) 03/11/2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-03-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 4 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0558) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-02-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0564) |
2016-02-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/18/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/11/2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/9/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2138 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 601