TN SB2111 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, increases the occupancy tax rate from 5 percent to 7 percent. - Amends Chapter 82 of the Private Acts of 2000.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 82 of the Private Acts of 2000; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to an occupancy tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2198 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2111&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SB2111.pdf |