TN SB2110 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, excludes United States central bank digital currency and accounts evidenced by a certificate of deposit from the definition of a deposit account for purposes of secured transactions under the Uniform Commercial Code. - Amends TCA Section 47-9-102.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 47-9-102, relative to secured transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1662 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-10 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee