TN HB1662 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-10 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, excludes United States central bank digital currency and accounts evidenced by a certificate of deposit from the definition of a deposit account for purposes of secured transactions under the Uniform Commercial Code. - Amends TCA Section 47-9-102.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 47-9-102, relative to secured transactions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-10HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2024-01-10HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2024-01-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-08HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2110 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback