TN SB2087 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that a person convicted of aggravated assault that involved the use or display of a deadly weapon be punished one classification higher than otherwise provided by law if the violation was committed by discharging a firearm from within a motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, relative to aggravated assault.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-06-06 | Pub. Ch. 1136 | |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0812) |
2022-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0612) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2009 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1136