TN SB2085 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends, from February 1, 2030, to February 1, 2031, the last year for which the department of revenue is required to annually report to the speakers of both houses and to the chairs of the finance, ways and means committees regarding sales tax collected on electronic nicotine delivery devices. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1686 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.