TN SB2085 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of commerce and insurance to issue a report and provide an educational presentation by January 31 each year concerning the methodologies and approaches used by the department to ensure health plans are complying with the federal Paul Wellstone and Pete Domenici Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act of 2008. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of commerce and insurance to issue a report and provide an educational presentation by January 31 each year concerning the methodologies and approaches used by the department to ensure health plans are complying with the federal Paul Wellstone and Pete Domenici Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act of 2008. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2499 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-01 - Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee