TN SB2067 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from March 31 to March 1, the date by which each municipal solid waste region must submit the annual progress report to the commissioner of environment and conservation for the immediately preceding calendar year that includes data on collection; recycling; transportation; disposal; public costs; and other information relevant to solid waste planning and management. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 47; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 47; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to waste management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2817 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.