TN SB2045 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the treatment of certain records obtained in the search for a director of schools or any chief public administrative officer from open for public inspection to confidential with certain exceptions; makes confidential, with certain exceptions, the records relating to the process of searching for and selecting of any applicant for a president of a state university, the president of a community college, and the president of a college of applied technology. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, changes the treatment of certain records obtained in the search for a director of schools or any chief public administrative officer from open for public inspection to confidential with certain exceptions; makes confidential, with certain exceptions, the records relating to the process of searching for and selecting of any applicant for a president of a state university, the president of a community college, and the president of a college of applied technology. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1998 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning