TN SB2022 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, continues the requirement that a temporary healthcare staffing agency presently doing business in this state provide notice to the health facilities commission identifying its business entity and any controlling person by December 31 of each year, instead of ending December 31, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to the health facilities commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1030) |
2024-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0859) |
2024-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0810) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1011) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2650 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.