TN SB2019 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 50 to 100 the number of patients to whom a licensed nurse practitioner or physician assistant who is authorized to prescribe Schedule II or III drugs may prescribe buprenorphine products; increases from four to 10 the maximum number of licensed nurse practitioners or physician assistants who prescribe buprenorphine products that a physician may supervise or collaborate with at one time; makes other changes relative to the use of buprenorphine products. - Amends TCA Title 33 and Title 53.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33 and Title 53, relative to the treatment of opiate addiction.
Sponsors
Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 83, Nays 5, PNV 2 |
2024-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0850) |
2024-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 1 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0702) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2060 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-11 - Sponsor(s) Added.