TN SB2007 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 2, PNV 1
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 2, PNV 1
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes public hospitals, upon approval of the hospital's governing body, to establish a state employee and retiree healthcare incentive program that will allow for the waiver of applicable out-of-pocket expenses associated with medical care at the public hospital for state employees and retirees and their covered dependents participating in the state group insurance plan. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 27, relative to public hospital state employee incentive programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 2, PNV 1 |
2024-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0956) |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0888) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1960 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Comp. SB subst.