TN SB1966 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Effective date(s) 05/09/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Effective date(s) 05/09/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates new categories of emergency first responders to assist EMTs in responding to emergencies, driving ambulances, and engaging in limited medical interventions; requires such persons to become licensed EMTs within a certain period of time. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55 and Title 68, relative to ground ambulance service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Effective date(s) 05/09/2022 | |
2022-05-11 | Pub. Ch. 1012 | |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/23/2022 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1981 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1012